AK SJR6 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-27 - COSPONSOR(S): BUNDE, MCGUIRE, MEYER, STEDMAN, OLSON, STEVENS
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Congress to reject H.R. 45, the Blair Holt's Firearm Licensing and Record of Sale Act of 2009.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oppose H.r. 45 In Congress

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-27 COSPONSOR(S): BUNDE, MCGUIRE, MEYER, STEDMAN, OLSON, STEVENS
2009-02-25 REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2009-02-25 FN1: ZERO(LEG)
2009-02-25 AM: FRENCH, PASKVAN
2009-02-25 NR: KOOKESH
2009-02-25 DP: MENARD, MEYER
2009-02-25 STA RPT CS 2DP 1NR 2AM SAME TITLE
2009-02-23 COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS
2009-02-19 COSPONSOR(S): MENARD, DYSON
2009-02-09 STA, JUD
2009-02-09 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback