AK SCR4 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC MEMBER, INDUSTRY REPRESENTATIVE, RYAN MARLOW
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to the Task Force on Unmanned Aircraft Systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force On Unmanned Aircraft Systems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to CSSCR 4(STA) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29SenateAPPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC MEMBER, INDUSTRY REPRESENTATIVE, RYAN MARLOW
2017-11-29HouseRYAN MARLOW, ANCHORAGE, INDUSTRY REPRESENTATIVE
2017-11-29HousePUBLIC MEMBER REPRESENTING:
2017-11-18SenatePERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
2017-07-27SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2017-07-27Senate1:57 PM 7/18/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-04-14SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
2017-04-14SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2017-04-13HouseVERSION: HCS CSSCR 4(AET) AM H
2017-04-13HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2017-04-13HousePASSED Y40
2017-04-13HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2017-04-13HouseAET HCS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-13HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-13HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2017
2017-03-29HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP, EASTMAN
2017-03-22HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-03-22HouseNR: NEUMAN
2017-03-22HouseDP: KNOPP, TALERICO, EDGMON, TUCK, JOSEPHSON, WESTLAKE
2017-03-22HouseAET RPT HCS(AET) 6DP 1NR
2017-03-14HouseAET
2017-03-14HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-13SenateVERSION: CSSCR 4(STA)
2017-03-13SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-03-13SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2017-03-13SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2017-03-13SenateSTA CS ADOPTED UC
2017-03-13SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-13SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/13/2017
2017-03-10SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-03-10SenateDP: DUNLEAVY, EGAN, COGHILL, GIESSEL, WILSON
2017-03-10SenateSTA RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
2017-02-22SenateSTA
2017-02-22SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback