AK SCR31 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 287, relating to the determination of the royalty received by the state on oil production refined or processed in the state; providing tax credits for qualified infrastructure expenditures for in-state refineries and hydrocarbon processing facilities; and approving and ratifying the sale of royalty oil by the State of Alaska to Tesoro Corporation and Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 287
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14 |
2014-07-02 | Senate | 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-23 | House | VERSION: SCR 31 |
2014-04-23 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-21 | House | PASSED Y39 A1 |
2014-04-21 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2014-04-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2014-04-20 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 31 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-04-20 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N1 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-04-20 | Senate | INTRODUCED AND HELD ON SECY'S DESK |