AK SCR30 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 306, relating to the review and administration of tax credit programs; requiring the Department of Revenue to report indirect expenditures; relating to the duties of state agencies; requiring the legislative finance division to analyze certain indirect expenditures; relating to lapse dates for appropriations for capital projects; and repealing the insurance tax education credit, the income tax education credit, the veteran employment tax credit, the oil or gas producer education credit, the property tax education credit, the mining business education credit, the fisheries business education credit, the fisheries business tax credit for scholarship contributions, the fisheries business salmon product development tax credit, the fisheries business salmon utilization tax credit, the fisheries business landing tax credit for scholarship contributions, the fisheries resource landing tax credit for the fisheries resource harvested under the community development quota, the fisheries resource landing tax education credit, and the film production tax credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 306

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-04-23 - House - House:
 SCR 30 Special Order of Business (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-02SenateDUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
2014-07-02Senate9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2014-04-25HouseVERSION: SCR 30
2014-04-25HouseRETURN TO (S) 4/24, TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2014-04-23HousePASSED Y33 E2 A5
2014-04-23HouseSPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS
2014-04-23HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME
2014-04-23SenateVERSION: SCR 30
2014-04-23SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2014-04-23SenatePASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
2014-04-23SenateTAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE
2014-04-20SenateINTRODUCED AND HELD ON SECY'S DESK

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback