AK SCR28 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 76, relating to the mariculture revolving loan fund and loans and grants from the fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 76

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27SenateLEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 42
2018-06-27Senate2:34 PM 6/12/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-05-09HouseVERSION: SCR 28
2018-05-09HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-05-09HousePASSED Y39 N1
2018-05-09HouseSPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS
2018-05-08HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME
2018-05-07SenateVERSION: SCR 28
2018-05-07SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-05-07SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-07SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2018-05-07SenateTAKEN UP UC
2018-05-07SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback