AK SCR25 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 156, relating to the duties of the State Board of Education and Early Development, the Department of Education and Early Development, school boards, and school districts; relating to public school curriculum and assessments; relating to compliance with federal education laws; relating to public school accountability; and relating to a statewide assessment plan and review of education laws and regulations.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 156
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE SENATE |
2016-05-23 | House | VERSION: SCR 25(FLD H) |
2016-05-23 | House | RETURNED TO SENATE |
2016-05-05 | House | ENGROSSED |
2016-05-05 | House | FAILED PASSAGE Y24 N15 E1 |
2016-05-05 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2016-04-17 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2016-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 25 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2016-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N4 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2016-04-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |