AK SCR25 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-09 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-09 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Joint Resolution No. 29, urging the United States Department of the Interior, Bureau of Land Management, to plug legacy wells properly and to reclaim the legacy well sites as soon as possible in order to protect the environment in the Arctic region.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hjr 29
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-09 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 31 | |
2012-05-31 | 1:50 PM 5/31/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-03-28 | VERSION: SCR 25 | |
2012-03-28 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2012-03-28 | PASSED Y37 E1 A2 | |
2012-03-28 | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS | |
2012-03-26 | READ THE FIRST TIME | |
2012-03-23 | VERSION: SCR 25 | |
2012-03-23 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2012-03-23 | PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2 | |
2012-03-23 | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2012-03-23 | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
Subjects
Environmental Concerns
Governor
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Leases
Oil & Gas
Permits
Uniform Rules
Water
Governor
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Leases
Oil & Gas
Permits
Uniform Rules
Water