AK SCR24 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-16 - PUBLIC MEMBERS: TERRENCE COLE, RICK HALFORD, CLEM TILLION
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-16 - PUBLIC MEMBERS: TERRENCE COLE, RICK HALFORD, CLEM TILLION
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Alaska Legislative Celebration Commission to organize events to commemorate the 100th anniversary of the first convening of the legislative branch of government in Alaska.
Title
Commission On 100th Anniv. Of Legislature
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-16 | PUBLIC MEMBERS: TERRENCE COLE, RICK HALFORD, CLEM TILLION | |
2012-07-16 | MEMBERS: STEVENS, HOFFMAN | |
2012-07-16 | MEMBERS: CHENAULT, STOLTZE | |
2012-05-31 | 1:50 PM 5/31/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-30 | FN3: (CC:HB284/LEG) | |
2012-04-30 | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 284 | |
2012-04-30 | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12 | |
2012-04-30 | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12 | |
2012-04-15 | VERSION: SCR 24 | |
2012-04-15 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2012-04-15 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y39 V1 | |
2012-04-15 | FN2: (LEG) ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-15 | RECON TAKEN UP - IN SECOND READING | |
2012-04-14 | STOLTZE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2012-04-14 | PASSED Y30 N9 V1 | |
2012-04-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-14 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2012 | |
2012-04-13 | FN1: (LEG) | |
2012-04-13 | DP: T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, NEUMAN, EDGMON, DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2012-04-13 | FIN RPT 8DP | |
2012-04-12 | FN1: (LEG) | |
2012-04-12 | DP: JOHANSEN, P.WILSON, KELLER, GRUENBERG, PETERSEN, LYNN | |
2012-04-12 | STA RPT 6DP | |
2012-04-09 | STA, FIN | |
2012-04-09 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-04-06 | VERSION: SCR 24 | |
2012-04-06 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2012-04-06 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2012-04-06 | BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2012-04-06 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-06 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | FN1: (LEG) | |
2012-04-04 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, OLSON, ELLIS | |
2012-04-04 | FIN RPT 7DP | |
2012-03-12 | FIN | |
2012-03-12 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |