AK SCR21 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 151, relating to the duties of the Department of Health and Social Services; relating to training and workload standards for employees of the Department of Health and Social Services and providing immunity from damages related to those standards; relating to foster care home licensing; relating to civil and criminal history background checks for foster care licensing and payments; relating to placement of a child in need of aid; relating to the rights and responsibilities of foster parents; and requiring the Department of Health and Social Services to provide information to a child or person released from the department's custody.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 151
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 43 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | 2:34 PM 6/12/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-10 | House | VERSION: SCR 21 |
2018-05-10 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-10 | House | PASSED Y38 E1 A1 |
2018-05-10 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2018-05-10 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2018-05-09 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 21 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2018-05-09 | Senate | TAKEN UP UC |
2018-04-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
Subjects
Adoption
Age Of Persons
Child Abuse
Child Custody
Courts
Crimes
Disclosure
Employment
Families
Foster Care
Health & Social Services
Hearings
Minors
Native Organizations
Privacy
Public Records
Uniform Rules
Age Of Persons
Child Abuse
Child Custody
Courts
Crimes
Disclosure
Employment
Families
Foster Care
Health & Social Services
Hearings
Minors
Native Organizations
Privacy
Public Records
Uniform Rules