AK SCR21 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-09 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-09 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to an amendment to Rule 20(a), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, relating to standing committees.
Title
Uniform Rls:educ./hss Standing Committees
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-09 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 44 | |
2012-05-31 | 1:50 PM 5/31/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-15 | VERSION: SCR 21 AM | |
2012-04-15 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2012-04-15 | PASSED Y38 A1 V1 | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2012 | |
2012-02-17 | RLS | |
2012-02-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-02-15 | VERSION: SCR 21 AM | |
2012-02-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2012-02-15 | PASSED Y14 N2 E4 | |
2012-02-15 | BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2012-02-15 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y16 N- E4 | |
2012-02-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-02-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/15/2012 | |
2012-02-10 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2012-02-10 | DP: MEYER, THOMAS, FRENCH, DAVIS, STEVENS | |
2012-02-10 | EDC RPT 5DP | |
2012-02-03 | EDC | |
2012-02-03 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |