AK SCR19 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-10 - 1:11 PM 7/10/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-10 - 1:11 PM 7/10/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 44, requiring a legislator to abstain from taking or withholding official action or exerting official influence that could benefit or harm an immediate family member or certain employers; and requiring a legislator to request to be excused from voting in an instance where the legislator may have a financial conflict of interest.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 44
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Senate | 1:11 PM 7/10/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-11 | House | VERSION: SCR 19 |
2018-05-11 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-11 | House | PASSED Y39 N1 |
2018-05-11 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2018-05-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2018-05-08 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 19 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N2 E1 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2018-05-08 | Senate | TAKEN UP UC |
2018-03-29 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |