AK SCR19 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-09 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-09 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaiming September 24, 2012, to be United States Marshals Day.
Title
Proclaiming United States Marshals Day
Sponsors
Sen. Frederick Dyson [R] | Rep. Max Gruenberg [D] | Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Rep. James Petersen [D] |
Rep. Chris Tuck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-09 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 43 | |
2012-06-01 | 11:45 AM 6/1/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-13 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TUCK, PETERSEN | |
2012-04-13 | VERSION: SCR 19 | |
2012-04-13 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2012-04-13 | PASSED Y38 A1 V1 | |
2012-04-13 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-13 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG | |
2012-04-10 | FN1: ZERO(S.STA) | |
2012-04-10 | DP: P.WILSON, KELLER, GRUENBERG, SEATON, PETERSEN, LYNN | |
2012-04-10 | STA RPT 6DP | |
2012-04-02 | STA | |
2012-04-02 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-03-30 | VERSION: SCR 19 | |
2012-03-30 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2012-03-30 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2012-03-30 | BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2012-03-30 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-03-30 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/2012 | |
2012-02-23 | FN1: ZERO(S.STA) | |
2012-02-23 | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, PASKVAN, MEYER, GIESSEL | |
2012-02-23 | STA RPT 5DP | |
2012-01-18 | STA | |
2012-01-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |