AK SCR18 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 49
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 49
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 101, exempting the full value of life insurance and annuity contracts from levy to satisfy a debt, and amending the description of earnings, income, cash, and other assets relating to garnishment of life insurance proceeds payable upon the death of an insured.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 101
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 49 | |
2010-07-09 | 11:40 AM 6/11/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: SCR 18 | |
2010-04-18 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y40 | |
2010-04-18 | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS | |
2010-04-07 | READ THE FIRST TIME | |
2010-04-06 | VERSION: SCR 18 | |
2010-04-06 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-04-06 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-04-06 | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2010-04-05 | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |