AK SCR17 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaiming April 2018 as Sexual Assault Awareness Month.
Title
April 2018:sexual Assault Awareness Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 Table (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 Table (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 Table (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 Table (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 Table (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 24 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-06-27 | Senate | 2:43 PM 5/24/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-04-13 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, GARA, JOHNSTON, JOSEPHSON, DRUMMOND |
2018-04-13 | House | VERSION: SCR 17 |
2018-04-13 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-13 | House | PASSED Y36 N1 E1 A2 |
2018-04-13 | House | AM NO 2 TABLED Y33 N5 E1 A1 |
2018-04-13 | House | RESCIND ACTION TABLE AM 2 UC |
2018-04-13 | House | AM NO 2 TABLED Y35 N3 E1 A1 |
2018-04-13 | House | AM NO 2 OFFERED |
2018-04-13 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N35 E1 A1 |
2018-04-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-12 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 4/12 - ON 4/13 CALENDAR |
2018-04-11 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): BIRCH, MILLETT, ZULKOSKY, CHENAULT |
2018-04-11 | House | HELD TO 4/12 CALENDAR |
2018-04-11 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-06 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-04-06 | House | DP: TUCK, BIRCH, KNOPP, LEDOUX, WOOL, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2018-04-06 | House | STA RPT 6DP |
2018-03-05 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, TUCK |
2018-03-05 | House | STA |
2018-03-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-03-01 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 17 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E3 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2018-03-01 | Senate | KELLY |
2018-03-01 | Senate | COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MACKINNON, STEDMAN, MICCICHE, VON IMHOF, SHOWER, OLSON |
2018-03-01 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER, COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, EGAN, WILSON, BISHOP |
2018-03-01 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-03-01 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | DP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, COGHILL, EGAN |
2018-02-28 | Senate | STA RPT 5DP |
2018-02-16 | Senate | STA |
2018-02-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |