AK SCR14 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/22 LEGIS RESOLVE 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/22 LEGIS RESOLVE 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 75, relating to the registration of marijuana establishments by municipalities; relating to the definition of "marijuana"; clarifying standards for personal use of marijuana by persons 21 years of age or older; prohibiting the public consumption of marijuana; authorizing the registration of marijuana clubs; and relating to established villages and to local option elections regarding the operation of marijuana establishments.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 75
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - House - House:
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
SCR 14 Special Order of Business(Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 9/22 LEGIS RESOLVE 51 |
2016-07-11 | Senate | 11:00 AM 7/1/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-05-18 | House | VERSION: SCR 14 |
2016-05-18 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2016-05-18 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2016-05-18 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2016-02-26 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2016-02-24 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 14 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2016-02-24 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2016-02-24 | Senate | TAKEN UP |
2015-04-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
Subjects
Appointments
Boards & Commissions
Drugs
Initiatives
Licensing
Municipalities
Regulations
Revenue
Sales
Taxation
Uniform Rules
Boards & Commissions
Drugs
Initiatives
Licensing
Municipalities
Regulations
Revenue
Sales
Taxation
Uniform Rules