AK SCR13 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the governor to establish and support programs designed to eradicate the occurrence of fetal alcohol spectrum disorder from the state.
Title
Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorder
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: CSSCR 13(HSS) Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: CSSCR 13(HSS) Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14 |
2014-07-02 | Senate | 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-20 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) -- SEE FULL TEXT ABOVE |
2014-04-16 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, HERRON, MILLETT, DRUMMOND, JOSEPHSON, TUCK |
2014-04-16 | House | VERSION: CSSCR 13(HSS) |
2014-04-16 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-16 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y37 E1 A2 |
2014-04-16 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2014-04-16 | House | JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2014-04-16 | House | PASSED Y38 N1 E1 |
2014-04-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-16 | House | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/16/14 |
2014-04-02 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HIGGINS, KELLER |
2014-04-02 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2014-04-02 | House | DP: SEATON, REINBOLD, PRUITT, KELLER, NAGEAK, TARR, HIGGINS |
2014-04-02 | House | HSS RPT 7DP |
2014-03-19 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI |
2014-03-18 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MUNOZ |
2014-03-18 | House | HSS |
2014-03-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-17 | Senate | VERSION: CSSCR 13(HSS) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-03-17 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI, HUGGINS, STEVENS |
2014-03-17 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH, COGHILL, GARDNER |
2014-03-17 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-03-17 | Senate | HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, MICCICHE, KELLY |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HSS RPT CS 3DP SAME TITLE |
2014-02-12 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS, STEDMAN, MCGUIRE, DYSON, DUNLEAVY |
2014-02-07 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, MEYER, MICCICHE, BISHOP |
2014-02-07 | Senate | HSS |
2014-02-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |