AK SCR11 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 5, relating to the persons who may be appointed conservators of a protected person.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 5
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-24 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 14 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | 3:30 PM 4/23/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-04-15 | House | VERSION: SCR 11 |
2015-04-15 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2015-04-15 | House | PASSED Y36 A4 |
2015-04-15 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2015-04-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2015-04-14 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 11 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2015-04-14 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2015-04-14 | Senate | TAKEN UP |
2015-04-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |