AK SCR1 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/16 LEGIS RESOLVE 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to a legislative task force on civics education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civics Education Task Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSCR 1(EDC)? (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-16 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-16SenatePERMANENTLY FILED 8/16 LEGIS RESOLVE 34
2016-08-11SenatePUBLIC MEMBERS: MICHAEL JOHNSON REPLACED KEITH HAMILTON
2016-07-11SenatePUBLIC MEMBERS: DANA FABE, FORREST NABORS
2016-07-11SenatePUBLIC MEMBERS: NORM WOOTEN, EMMA POTTER
2016-07-11SenatePUBLIC MEMBERS: KEITH HAMILTON, PAMELA ORME
2016-07-11SenateMEMBERS: STEVENS (CHAIR), COSTELLO, GARDNER
2016-06-18HouseMEMBERS: SPOHNHOLZ REPLACED CLAMAN
2016-06-17HouseMEMBERS: KELLER, (VICE CHAIR) PRUITT, CLAMAN
2016-04-27SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2016-04-27Senate10:51 AM 4/26/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2016-04-17SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
2016-04-17SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
2016-04-16HouseVERSION: HCS CSSCR 1(EDC)
2016-04-16HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2016-04-16HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, MILLETT, JOSEPHSON
2016-04-16HousePASSED Y39 E1
2016-04-16HouseEDC HCS ADOPTED UC
2016-04-16HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2016-04-16HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2016
2016-04-12HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG
2016-04-12HouseFN3: ZERO(H.EDC/LEG)
2016-04-12HouseTHOMPSON
2016-04-12HouseDP: KAWASAKI, GATTIS, PRUITT, WILSON, GARA, EDGMON, MUNOZ, GUTTENBERG,
2016-04-12HouseFIN RPT HCS(EDC) 9DP
2016-03-18HouseFN3: ZERO(H.EDC/LEG)
2016-03-18HouseDP: TALERICO, DRUMMOND, SEATON, COLVER, SPOHNHOLZ, KELLER
2016-03-18HouseEDC RPT HCS(EDC) 6DP
2015-04-13HouseEDC, FIN
2015-04-13HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2015-04-13SenateVERSION: CSSCR 1(EDC)
2015-04-13SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2015-04-13SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2015-04-13SenateCOSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, MACKINNON, BISHOP, MICCICHE, COGHILL, HOFFMAN, GARDNER
2015-04-13SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2015-04-13SenateEDC CS ADOPTED UC
2015-04-13SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2015-04-13SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2015
2015-04-10SenateFN2: ZERO(S.FIN/LEG)
2015-04-10SenateNR: MICCICHE, OLSON
2015-04-10SenateDP: KELLY, MACKINNON, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN
2015-04-10SenateFIN RPT CS(EDC) 5DP 2NR
2015-03-16SenateFN1: (LEG)
2015-03-16SenateDP: DUNLEAVY, STEVENS, HUGGINS, GARDNER
2015-03-16SenateEDC RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
2015-01-21SenateEDC, FIN
2015-01-21SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback