AK SCR1 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-22 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-22 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Designating May of each year as Lupus Awareness Month.
Title
Lupus Awareness Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2012-02-22 | FN2: ZERO(LEG) | |
2012-02-22 | DP: MILLETT, KERTTULA, DICK, SEATON, MILLER, HERRON, KELLER | |
2012-02-22 | HSS RPT 7DP | |
2011-04-14 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOLMES | |
2011-04-07 | HSS | |
2011-04-07 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-04-06 | VERSION: CSSCR 1(STA) | |
2011-04-06 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2011-04-06 | PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1 | |
2011-04-06 | STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-06 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-06 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | FN1: ZERO(S.STA) | |
2011-03-16 | DP: DAVIS, MEYER, ELLIS, EGAN, DYSON | |
2011-03-16 | HSS RPT CS(STA) 5DP | |
2011-03-09 | FN1: ZERO(S.STA) | |
2011-03-09 | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, PASKVAN, MEYER, GIESSEL | |
2011-03-09 | STA RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE | |
2011-01-19 | STA, HSS | |
2011-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |