AK SCR1 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-16 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-16 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to establishing March 2009 as Brain Injury Awareness Month.
Title
Brain Injury Awareness Month: March 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | PERMANENTLY FILED 4/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 2 | |
2009-03-11 | 12:03 PM 3/11/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-03-09 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG, JOHNSON, DAHLSTROM | |
2009-03-09 | VERSION: SCR 1 | |
2009-03-09 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2009-03-09 | PASSED Y32 E6 A2 | |
2009-03-09 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-03-09 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/9/2009 | |
2009-03-05 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN | |
2009-03-05 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2009-03-05 | DP: COGHILL, SEATON, LYNN, CISSNA, KELLER | |
2009-03-05 | HSS RPT 5DP | |
2009-02-27 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA | |
2009-02-27 | HSS | |
2009-02-27 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-02-25 | VERSION: SCR 1 | |
2009-02-25 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2009-02-25 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2009-02-25 | BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2009-02-25 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-02-25 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/2009 | |
2009-02-13 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2009-02-13 | DP: DAVIS, ELLIS, PASKVAN | |
2009-02-13 | HSS RPT 3DP | |
2009-01-21 | HSS | |
2009-01-21 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |