AK SB95 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/17/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alaska Railroad/state Land Transfers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alaska Railroad/state Land Transfers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to SB 95 Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/17/19
2019-08-16SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 8/16 CHAPTER 22 SLA 19
2019-08-13Senate11:31 AM 8/13/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-05-14SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-05-14SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
2019-05-14SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2019-05-14HouseVERSION: HCS SB 95(RES) AM H
2019-05-14HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2019-05-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JACKSON
2019-05-14HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 5
2019-05-14HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-05-14HousePASSED Y40
2019-05-14HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 95(RES) AM H
2019-05-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-14HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2019-05-14HouseRES HCS ADOPTED UC
2019-05-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2019
2019-05-09HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2019-05-09HouseNR: HANNAN, SPOHNHOLZ, HOPKINS
2019-05-09HouseDP: TALERICO, TARR, LINCOLN
2019-05-09HousePENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
2019-05-09HouseRES RPT HCS(RES) NT 3DP 3NR
2019-05-08HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
2019-04-27HouseRES
2019-04-27HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-04-26SenateVERSION: SB 95
2019-04-26SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2019-04-26SenateCOSPONSOR(S): STEDMAN, GIESSEL
2019-04-26SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-04-26SenatePASSED Y17 N- E3
2019-04-26SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 95
2019-04-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-04-26SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-04-25SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2019
2019-04-24SenateFN1: ZERO(CED)
2019-04-24SenateNR: STEDMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, WILSON
2019-04-24SenateDP: VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, BISHOP
2019-04-24SenateFIN RPT 3DP 4NR
2019-04-15SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BISHOP, STEVENS
2019-04-08SenateFN1: ZERO(CED)
2019-04-08SenateNR: KAWASAKI
2019-04-08SenateDP: BIRCH, KIEHL, GIESSEL, COGHILL
2019-04-08SenateRES RPT 4DP 1NR
2019-03-29SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
2019-03-22SenateRES, FIN
2019-03-22SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback