AK SB91 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to telehealth; relating to multidisciplinary care teams; and relating to the practice of medicine.
Title
Telehealth: Multidisciplinary Care Team
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Claman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-04-05 | House | FN3: (CED) |
2024-04-05 | House | NR: SUMNER |
2024-04-05 | House | DP: FIELDS, RUFFRIDGE, MCCORMICK, MINA, PRAX |
2024-04-05 | House | HSS RPT 5DP 1NR |
2024-03-25 | House | HSS, FIN |
2024-03-25 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-03-22 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 91(FIN) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | PASSED Y16 E4 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 91(FIN) |
2024-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/22 CAL |
2024-03-20 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2024-03-20 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-03-19 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | FN2: (CED) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | NR: WILSON, MERRICK |
2024-03-01 | Senate | DP: OLSON, BISHOP |
2024-03-01 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE |
2023-04-14 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2023-04-14 | Senate | DNP: GIESSEL |
2023-04-14 | Senate | NR: WILSON, TOBIN, KAUFMAN, DUNBAR |
2023-04-14 | Senate | HSS RPT CS 1DNP 4NR SAME TITLE |
2023-03-06 | Senate | HSS, FIN |
2023-03-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Communications
Health & Social Services
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Physicians
Science & Technology
Health & Social Services
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Physicians
Science & Technology