AK SB91 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/17/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Nuyakuk River: Hydroelectric Site

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nuyakuk River: Hydroelectric Site

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/17/19
2019-08-16SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 8/16 CHAPTER 20 SLA 19
2019-08-13Senate11:31 AM 8/13/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-05-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): WOOL, TUCK
2019-05-14HouseVERSION: CSSB 91(FIN)
2019-05-14HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2019-05-14HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-05-14HousePASSED Y40
2019-05-14HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 91(FIN)
2019-05-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2019
2019-05-11HouseFN2: ZERO(DNR)
2019-05-11HouseDP: TUCK, HANNAN, TALERICO, HOPKINS, RAUSCHER, SPOHNHOLZ, LINCOLN, TARR
2019-05-11HouseRES RPT 8DP
2019-05-08HouseRES
2019-05-08HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-05-07SenateVERSION: CSSB 91(FIN)
2019-05-07SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2019-05-07SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-05-07SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2019-05-07SenateOLSON, GIESSEL
2019-05-07SenateCOSPONSOR(S): STEVENS, BISHOP, STEDMAN, GRAY-JACKSON, REINBOLD, HUGHES, KIEHL
2019-05-07SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 91(FIN)
2019-05-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-07SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2019-05-07SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-07SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2019
2019-05-06SenateFN1: (DNR)
2019-05-06SenateNR: VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, SHOWER, WILSON
2019-05-06SenateDP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, BISHOP
2019-05-06SenateFIN RPT CS 3DP 4NR SAME TITLE
2019-04-22SenateFN1: (DNR)
2019-04-22SenateNR: REINBOLD, KAWASAKI
2019-04-22SenateDP: BIRCH, KIEHL, COGHILL
2019-04-22SenateRES RPT 3DP 2NR
2019-03-15SenateRES, FIN
2019-03-15SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback