AK SB88 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing certain provisions relating to modifying the factors that apply to calculate the amount of power cost equalization; providing for an effective date by repealing the effective date of sec. 3, ch. 2, 4SSLA 2008; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Power Cost Equalization
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2009-08-05 | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/17 CHAPTER 59 SLA 09 | |
2009-08-05 | 8:25 AM 6/30/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-04-19 | VERSION: SB 88 | |
2009-04-19 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2009-04-19 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-19 | PASSED Y39 N1 | |
2009-04-19 | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 88 | |
2009-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/19 CALENDAR | |
2009-04-18 | FN2: (CED) CORRECTED | |
2009-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2009 | |
2009-04-17 | FN2: (CED) | |
2009-04-17 | NR: KELLY | |
2009-04-17 | STOLTZE | |
2009-04-17 | DP: THOMAS, FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, CRAWFORD, AUSTERMAN, SALMON, JOULE, HAWKER, | |
2009-04-17 | FIN RPT 9DP 1NR | |
2009-04-08 | FIN | |
2009-04-08 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-07 | VERSION: SB 88 | |
2009-04-07 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2009-04-07 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-07 | PASSED Y15 N4 V1 | |
2009-04-07 | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 88 | |
2009-04-07 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-07 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-07 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2009 | |
2009-04-06 | FN1: (CED) | |
2009-04-06 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, OLSON | |
2009-04-06 | FIN RPT 5DP | |
2009-01-28 | FIN | |
2009-01-28 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |