AK SB81 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/25/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/25/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to criminal and civil history record checks and requirements; relating to licenses, certifications, appeals, and authorizations by the Department of Health and Social Services; relating to child protection information; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Dhss Cent. Registry;license;bckground Chk
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 81(HSS) Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/25/18 |
2018-07-25 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/24 CHAPTER 69 SLA 18 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-07-20 | Senate | 9:35 AM 7/20/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-11 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2018-05-10 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 81(JUD) |
2018-05-10 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2018-05-10 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-10 | House | PASSED Y35 N1 E1 A3 |
2018-05-10 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING |
2018-05-10 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2018-05-10 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 81(JUD) |
2018-05-09 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR |
2018-05-09 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N28 A1 |
2018-05-09 | House | JUD HCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-09 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2018 |
2018-04-27 | House | FN4: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-04-27 | House | FN3: ZERO(DPS) |
2018-04-27 | House | AM: EASTMAN, LEDOUX |
2018-04-27 | House | NR: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, REINBOLD |
2018-04-27 | House | DP: STUTES, CLAMAN |
2018-04-27 | House | JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 2DP 3NR 2AM |
2018-04-23 | House | JUD |
2018-04-23 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-20 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 81(HSS) |
2018-04-20 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-04-20 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-20 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-04-20 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 81(HSS) |
2018-04-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-20 | Senate | HSS CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-20 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-20 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DPS) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, SHOWER, KELLY |
2018-04-19 | Senate | DP: COGHILL |
2018-04-19 | Senate | JUD RPT CS(HSS) 1DP 3NR |
2018-03-19 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DPS) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | DP: BEGICH, VON IMHOF |
2018-03-19 | Senate | NR: WILSON, MICCICHE |
2018-03-19 | Senate | HSS RPT CS 2DP 2NR NEW TITLE |
2017-03-08 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2017-03-08 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | HSS, JUD |
2017-03-08 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Administrative Procedure
Child Abuse
Crimes
Families
Federal Aid
Health & Social Services
Liability
Licensing
Medical Care
Public Assistance
Public Records
Senior Citizens
Child Abuse
Crimes
Families
Federal Aid
Health & Social Services
Liability
Licensing
Medical Care
Public Assistance
Public Records
Senior Citizens