AK SB74 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act creating the University of Alaska building fund for the payment by the University of Alaska of the costs of use, management, operation, maintenance, and depreciation of space in buildings; and authorizing the Board of Regents of the University of Alaska to designate buildings for which the fund is to be used.
Title
University Of Alaska Building Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/14 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/17 CHAPTER 23 SLA 14 |
2014-06-13 | Senate | 12:00 PM 6/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-19 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2014-04-19 | House | VERSION: SB 74 |
2014-04-19 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-19 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2014-04-19 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 74 |
2014-04-19 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-19 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-19 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2014 |
2014-04-19 | House | FN6: ZERO(UA) |
2014-04-19 | House | FN5: ZERO(REV) |
2014-04-19 | House | FN4: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-19 | House | STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN |
2014-04-19 | House | DP: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, THOMPSON, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, EDGMON, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, |
2014-04-19 | House | FIN RPT 10DP |
2013-04-13 | House | IN FINANCE |
2013-04-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT |
2013-04-11 | House | FIN |
2013-04-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-04-11 | Senate | VERSION: SB 74 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N- |
2013-04-11 | Senate | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-11 | Senate | KELLY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2013-04-11 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2013-04-11 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 74 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-11 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-11 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(REV) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(UA) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2013-04-08 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MEYER, HOFFMAN, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH, DUNLEAVY |
2013-04-08 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP 1NR |
2013-03-11 | Senate | FIN |
2013-03-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |