AK SB6 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, GRENN
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the regulation and production of industrial hemp; relating to industrial hemp pilot programs; providing that industrial hemp is not included in the definition of 'marijuana'; and clarifying that adding industrial hemp to food does not create an adulterated food product.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial Hemp Production

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, GRENN
2017-04-12House1ST CROSS SPONSOR: KAWASAKI
2017-04-11HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KITO
2017-04-11HouseREFERRED TO FINANCE
2017-04-11HouseFIN
2017-04-11HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-10SenateVERSION: CSSB 6(JUD)
2017-04-10SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-04-10SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2017-04-10SenateCOSPONSOR(S): GARDNER, BEGICH
2017-04-10SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 6(JUD)
2017-04-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-10SenateJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-10SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-10SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2017
2017-04-10SenateFN10: (S.FIN/DNR)
2017-04-10SenateFN8: ZERO(DPS)
2017-04-10SenateFN7: ZERO(CED)
2017-04-10SenateFN6: ZERO(LAW)
2017-04-10SenateFN5: ZERO(DPS)
2017-04-10SenateNR: MACKINNON, DUNLEAVY, OLSON, MICCICHE
2017-04-10SenateDP: HOFFMAN, BISHOP, VON IMHOF
2017-04-10SenateFIN RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 4NR
2017-04-07SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BISHOP
2017-03-22SenateFN9: (DNR)
2017-03-22SenateFN8: ZERO(DPS)
2017-03-22SenateFN7: ZERO(CED)
2017-03-22SenateFN6: ZERO(LAW)
2017-03-22SenateFN5: ZERO(DPS)
2017-03-22SenateDP: COGHILL, KELLY, MEYER, COSTELLO, WIELECHOWSKI
2017-03-22SenateJUD RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
2017-02-17SenateFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
2017-02-17SenateFN4: ZERO(DPS)
2017-02-17SenateFN3: ZERO(DPS)
2017-02-17SenateFN2: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
2017-02-17SenateFN1: ZERO(LAW)
2017-02-17SenateNR: STEDMAN
2017-02-17SenateDP: GIESSEL, HUGHES, COGHILL, VON IMHOF, MEYER
2017-02-17SenateRES RPT CS 5DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2017-01-18SenateRES, JUD
2017-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-09SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback