AK SB57 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - FN4: (DOH)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - FN4: (DOH)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the sharing of confidential health information between the Department of Health and the Department of Family and Community Services; relating to home- and community-based services under the medical assistance program; relating to medical assistance for recipients of Medicaid waivers; establishing a host care home license and procedures; providing for the transition of individuals from foster care to host home care settings; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Adult Home Care; Med Assist.; Health Info
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to CSSB 57(FIN) am Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-16 | House | FN4: (DOH) |
2023-10-16 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 39 |
2023-10-16 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/28/23 |
2023-10-16 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/28/23 |
2023-10-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2023-10-16 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/29 CHAPTER 22 SLA 23 |
2023-10-16 | Senate | 10:55 A.M. 7/14/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-10-16 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 3 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-05-10 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2023-05-09 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2023-05-08 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 57(FIN) AM H |
2023-05-08 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2023-05-08 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 3 |
2023-05-08 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-05-08 | House | PASSED Y39 N1 |
2023-05-08 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 57(FIN) AM H |
2023-05-08 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2023-05-08 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2023-05-08 | House | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC |
2023-05-08 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2023-05-08 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2023-05-08 | House | AM 1 TO AM 1 FAILED Y1 N39 |
2023-05-08 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2023-05-08 | House | FIN HCS ADOPTED UC |
2023-05-08 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-05-08 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2023 |
2023-05-01 | House | FN7: (DOH) |
2023-05-01 | House | FN6: ZERO(DOH) |
2023-05-01 | House | FN5: ZERO(DOH) |
2023-05-01 | House | FN4: (DOH) |
2023-05-01 | House | FN3: (DOH) |
2023-05-01 | House | D.JOHNSON, EDGMON, FOSTER |
2023-05-01 | House | DP: STAPP, GALVIN, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, TOMASZEWSKI, COULOMBE, CRONK, |
2023-05-01 | House | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 11DP |
2023-04-26 | House | FIN |
2023-04-26 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-04-24 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 57(FIN) AM |
2023-04-24 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-04-24 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 57(FIN) AM |
2023-04-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2023-04-24 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2023-04-24 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2023-04-24 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2023-04-24 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-04-24 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/23 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(DOH) |
2023-04-21 | Senate | FN4: (DOH) |
2023-04-21 | Senate | FN3: (DOH) |
2023-04-21 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, OLSON, MERRICK |
2023-04-21 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, BISHOP, KIEHL |
2023-04-21 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 3DP 3NR SAME TITLE |
2023-03-10 | Senate | FN2: (DOH) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | FN1: (DOH) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | NR: TOBIN, KAUFMAN |
2023-03-10 | Senate | DP: WILSON, DUNBAR, GIESSEL |
2023-03-10 | Senate | HSS RPT 3DP 2NR |
2023-02-06 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2023-02-06 | Senate | FN2: (DOH) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | FN1: (DOH) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | HSS, FIN |
2023-02-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Age Of Persons
Disabilities
Families
Federal Aid
Foster Care
Health & Social Services
Licensing
Medical Care
Nursing Homes
Public Assistance
Disabilities
Families
Federal Aid
Foster Care
Health & Social Services
Licensing
Medical Care
Nursing Homes
Public Assistance