AK SB46 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making and amending appropriations, including capital appropriations, savings deposits in the form of appropriations to the statutory budget reserve fund, and other appropriations; making appropriations to capitalize funds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Budget: Capital
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-24 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2011-08-24 | PARTIAL VETO AND REDUCTIONS | |
2011-08-24 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 5 FSSLA 11 | |
2011-06-24 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2011-06-24 | 2:03 PM 6/8/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2011-05-14 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-05-14 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N- E2 | |
2011-05-14 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2011-05-14 | VERSION: HCS CSSB 46(FIN) | |
2011-05-14 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2011-05-14 | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP | |
2011-05-13 | JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2011-05-13 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-05-13 | PASSED Y30 N7 E3 | |
2011-05-13 | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 46(FIN) | |
2011-05-13 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-05-13 | AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N28 E3 | |
2011-05-13 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N26 E3 | |
2011-05-13 | FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-05-13 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-05-13 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | |
2011-05-13 | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2011 | |
2011-05-13 | NR: GARA, DOOGAN | |
2011-05-13 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GUTTENBERG, T.WILSON, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, STOLTZE | |
2011-05-13 | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 8DP 2NR | |
2011-05-10 | FIN | |
2011-05-10 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-05-10 | VERSION: CSSB 46(FIN) | |
2011-05-10 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2011-05-10 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y16 N- E4 | |
2011-05-10 | PASSED Y13 N3 E4 | |
2011-05-10 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 46(FIN) | |
2011-05-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-05-10 | AM NO 3 FAILED Y3 N13 E4 | |
2011-05-10 | AM NO 2 FAILED Y3 N13 E4 | |
2011-05-10 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N13 E4 | |
2011-05-10 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-05-10 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-05-10 | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/10/11 | |
2011-05-10 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, OLSON, ELLIS | |
2011-05-10 | FIN RPT CS 7DP NEW TITLE | |
2011-04-18 | SPECIAL SESSION BILL | |
2011-04-18 | SPECIAL SESSION BILL | |
2011-01-19 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | |
2011-01-19 | FIN | |
2011-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |