AK SB45 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act raising the minimum age to purchase, sell, exchange, or possess tobacco, a product containing nicotine, or an electronic smoking product; relating to selling a tobacco product; relating to possession of tobacco, electronic smoking products, or products containing nicotine by an underaged person; relating to the definition of 'nicotine'; relating to transporting tobacco, a product containing nicotine, or an electronic smoking product; relating to the taxation of electronic smoking products; relating to electronic smoking products; relating to the marketing of electronic smoking products; relating to tobacco products; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Age For Tobacco/nicotine/e-cig; Tax E-cig

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to CSSB 45(FIN) Effective Date(s) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 9 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-31SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2022-05-18SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2022-05-18SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2022-05-18SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N2
2022-05-18SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
2022-05-18HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 45(FIN) AM H
2022-05-18HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2022-05-18HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2022-05-18HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 16
2022-05-18HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y34 N6
2022-05-18HousePASSED Y31 N9
2022-05-18HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 45(FIN) AM H
2022-05-18HouseLIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4
2022-05-17HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR
2022-05-17HouseAM NO 3 ADOPTED Y23 N15 E2
2022-05-17HouseAM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
2022-05-17HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N19 E3 A1
2022-05-17HouseFIN HCS ADOPTED UC
2022-05-17HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-05-17HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022
2022-05-15HouseFN7: (REV)
2022-05-15HouseFN6: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2022-05-15HouseFN4: ZERO(DHS/DOH)
2022-05-15HouseAM: ORTIZ, EDGMON, WOOL, FOSTER
2022-05-15HouseNR: JOHNSON, LEBON, CARPENTER, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK
2022-05-15HouseDP: JOSEPHSON
2022-05-15HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 16
2022-05-15HouseFIN RPT HCS(FIN) NEW TITLE 1DP 5NR 4AM
2022-04-25HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): HANNAN
2022-04-25HouseFIN
2022-04-25HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2022-04-20SenateVERSION: CSSB 45(FIN)
2022-04-20SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2022-04-20SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2022-04-20SenatePASSED Y15 N4 E1
2022-04-20SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2022-04-20SenateAM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N10 E1
2022-04-20SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UC
2022-04-20SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 45(FIN)
2022-04-19SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/20 CAL
2022-04-19SenateAM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N12 E2
2022-04-19SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2022-04-19SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-04-19SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2022
2022-04-15SenateFN6: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2022-04-15SenateFN5: (REV)
2022-04-15SenateFN4: ZERO(DHS/DOH)
2022-04-15SenateDP: HOFFMAN
2022-04-15SenateNR: STEDMAN, BISHOP, WIELECHOWSKI
2022-04-15SenateFIN RPT CS 3NR 1DP NEW TITLE
2021-03-24SenateFN3: ZERO(CED)
2021-03-24SenateFN2: (REV)
2021-03-24SenateFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2021-03-24SenateAM: HOLLAND
2021-03-24SenateDP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS
2021-03-24SenateL&C RPT CS 3DP 1AM NEW TITLE
2021-01-25SenateL&C, FIN
2021-01-25SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-01-25SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/15/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=SB45
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0045A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0045B.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0045C.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0045D.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/F/SB0045-1-2-032421-DHS-N.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0045E.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0045Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=SB45&Page=02347#AM1
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=SB45&Page=02370#AM2
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=SB45&Page=02371#2371
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB45&Page=02982#AM1
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB45&Page=02984#AM3
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB45&Page=02983#AM1
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB45&Page=03075#3075
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB45&Page=03087#3087
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB45&Page=03088#3088
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=SB45&Page=02963#2963

Bill Comments

feedback