AK SB40 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/18/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the month of February as Black History Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Black History Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/18/19
2019-10-23SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 9/19 CHAPTER 27 SLA 19
2019-10-23Senate2:25 P.M. 9/13/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-05-02HouseLEDOUX, JACKSON, HANNAN
2019-05-02HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, SPOHNHOLZ, HOPKINS, KOPP, STORY,
2019-05-02HouseVERSION: SB 40
2019-05-02HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2019-05-02HousePASSED Y37 N1 E2
2019-05-02HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 40
2019-05-02HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-02HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-02HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2019
2019-04-08HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK
2019-04-08HouseRLS
2019-04-08HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-04-05SenateVERSION: SB 40
2019-04-05SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2019-04-05SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2019-04-05SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 40
2019-04-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-04-05SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-04-05SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2019
2019-04-05SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2019-04-05SenateDP: SHOWER, KAWASAKI, COGHILL, MICCICHE
2019-04-05SenateSTA RPT 4DP
2019-04-03SenateSTA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
2019-02-01SenateCOSTELLO, STEVENS, VON IMHOF, STEDMAN, BISHOP, MICCICHE, COGHILL
2019-02-01SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, KAWASAKI, KIEHL, BIRCH, WILSON,
2019-01-28SenateSTA
2019-01-28SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback