AK SB37 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the crime of airbag fraud.
Title
Crime Counterfeit/nonfunctioning Airbag
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Claman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-02-26 | House | FN10: ZERO(DPS) |
2024-02-26 | House | FN9: ZERO(LAW) |
2024-02-26 | House | FN8: ZERO(COR) |
2024-02-26 | House | FN7: ZERO(ADM) |
2024-02-26 | House | FN6: ZERO(ADM) |
2024-02-26 | House | NR: SADDLER |
2024-02-26 | House | DP: PRAX, RUFFRIDGE, CARRICK, SUMNER |
2024-02-26 | House | L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 4DP 1NR |
2023-05-09 | House | L&C |
2023-05-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-05-08 | Senate | VERSION: SB 37 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2023-05-08 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2023-05-08 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 37 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/8 CAL |
2023-05-05 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-05-05 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/23 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(DPS) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(LAW) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(COR) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | NR: TOBIN, KAUFMAN, KIEHL |
2023-04-05 | Senate | DP: CLAMAN |
2023-04-05 | Senate | JUD RPT 1DP 3NR |
2023-01-18 | Senate | JUD |
2023-01-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-01-18 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/13/23 |