AK SB37 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Renewal Of Vaccine Assessment Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewal Of Vaccine Assessment Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2019-05-06HouseVERSION: CSSB 37(FIN)
2019-05-06HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2019-05-06HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-05-06HousePASSED Y35 N1 E4
2019-05-06HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 37(FIN)
2019-05-06HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-06HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-06HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2019
2019-05-02HouseFN4: (S.FIN/FUND TRANSFERS)
2019-05-02HouseFN3: (S.FIN/FUND CAP)
2019-05-02HouseFN2: (S.FIN/DHS)
2019-05-02HouseNR: CARPENTER, TILTON, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2019-05-02HouseDP: JOHNSTON, LEBON, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, WILSON, FOSTER
2019-05-02HouseFIN RPT 7DP 4NR
2019-04-24HouseFN4: (S.FIN/FUND TRANSFERS)
2019-04-24HouseFN3: (S.FIN/FUND CAP)
2019-04-24HouseFN2: (S.FIN/DHS)
2019-04-24HouseNR: PRUITT
2019-04-24HouseDP: DRUMMOND, JACKSON, TARR, ZULKOSKY, SPOHNHOLZ
2019-04-24HouseHSS RPT 5DP 1NR
2019-03-29HouseHSS, FIN
2019-03-29HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-03-27SenateVERSION: CSSB 37(FIN)
2019-03-27SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2019-03-27SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-03-27SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2019-03-27SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 37(FIN)
2019-03-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-03-27SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2019-03-27SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-03-27SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2019
2019-03-22SenateCOSPONSOR(S): KIEHL, WILSON, STEVENS
2019-03-13SenateFN4: (S.FIN/FUND TRANSFERS)
2019-03-13SenateFN3: (S.FIN/FUND CAP)
2019-03-13SenateFN2: (S.FIN/DHS)
2019-03-13SenateNR: STEDMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON
2019-03-13SenateDP: VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, SHOWER, WILSON, BISHOP
2019-03-13SenateFIN RPT CS 5DP 3NR NEW TITLE
2019-02-08SenateFN1: (DHS)
2019-02-08SenateDP: WILSON, BEGICH, COGHILL, STEVENS, GIESSEL
2019-02-08SenateHSS RPT 5DP
2019-01-25SenateHSS, FIN
2019-01-25SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback