AK SB3 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/11/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/11/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the regulation of wastewater discharge from small commercial passenger vessels in state waters; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Small Vessel Wastewater Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SB 3 Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/11/17 |
2017-10-06 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/10 CHAPTER 21 SLA 17 |
2017-10-06 | Senate | 2:50 PM 7/31/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-05-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2017-05-16 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC |
2017-05-13 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2017-05-12 | House | VERSION: HCS SB 3(TRA) |
2017-05-12 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2017-05-12 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 9 |
2017-05-12 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-05-12 | House | PASSED Y35 N1 E4 |
2017-05-12 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 3(TRA) |
2017-05-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-05-12 | House | TRA HCS ADOPTED UC |
2017-05-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-05-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2017 |
2017-04-15 | House | FN3: ZERO(DOT) |
2017-04-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2017-04-15 | House | AM: KAWASAKI |
2017-04-15 | House | NR: TILTON |
2017-04-15 | House | DP: GARA, WILSON, ORTIZ, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, THOMPSON, PRUITT, SEATON, FOSTER |
2017-04-15 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 9 |
2017-04-15 | House | FIN RPT HCS(TRA) NT 9DP 1NR 1AM |
2017-03-01 | House | FN2: ZERO(DOT) |
2017-03-01 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2017-03-01 | House | NR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD |
2017-03-01 | House | DP: CLAMAN, KOPP, DRUMMOND, WOOL, STUTES |
2017-03-01 | House | PENDING TITLE CHANGE: HCR 9 |
2017-03-01 | House | TRA RPT HCS(TRA) NT 5DP 1NR |
2017-02-20 | House | TRA, FIN |
2017-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-02-17 | Senate | VERSION: SB 3 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-02-17 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N2 E2 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 3 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/17 CALENDAR |
2017-02-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-02-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/15/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DOT) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | AM: WIELECHOWSKI |
2017-02-08 | Senate | NR: HUGHES, COGHILL, VON IMHOF |
2017-02-08 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, STEDMAN, MEYER |
2017-02-08 | Senate | RES RPT 3DP 3NR 1AM |
2017-01-18 | Senate | RES |
2017-01-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17 |