AK SB27 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to industrial hemp; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Industrial Hemp Program;manufacturing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-30 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2021-08-30 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/29 CHAPTER 32 SLA 21 |
2021-08-19 | Senate | 10:00 A.M. 8/19/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-28 | House | FN2: (DNR) |
2021-06-28 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 69 |
2021-06-28 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21 |
2021-05-19 | House | RAUSCHER |
2021-05-19 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): NELSON, DRUMMOND, HANNAN, TARR, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, STORY, |
2021-05-19 | House | VERSION: CSSB 27(RES) |
2021-05-19 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-19 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y40 |
2021-05-19 | House | PASSED Y38 N2 |
2021-05-19 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 27(RES) |
2021-05-19 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-19 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2021-05-19 | House | TAKEN FROM TABLE UC |
2021-05-19 | House | MOTION TO TABLE UC |
2021-05-19 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-19 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021 |
2021-05-19 | House | LIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1 |
2021-05-17 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, THOMPSON |
2021-05-17 | House | FN2: (DNR) |
2021-05-17 | House | FOSTER |
2021-05-17 | House | DP: EDGMON, LEBON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK, |
2021-05-17 | House | FIN RPT 9DP |
2021-05-12 | House | RES REFERRAL REMOVED |
2021-05-12 | House | RES, FIN |
2021-05-12 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-10 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 27(RES) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2021-05-10 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, REVAK, KIEHL, GRAY-JACKSON, HOLLAND, STEVENS |
2021-05-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 27(RES) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-10 | Senate | RES CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-10 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-10 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2021 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | FN2: (DNR) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, VON IMHOF |
2021-05-10 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WILSON |
2021-05-10 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(RES) 3DP 4NR |
2021-04-09 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES |
2021-04-09 | Senate | FN1: (DNR) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE, BISHOP |
2021-04-09 | Senate | DP: REVAK, KAWASAKI, STEVENS, VON IMHOF, KIEHL |
2021-04-09 | Senate | RES RPT CS 5DP 2NR SAME TITLE |
2021-03-17 | Senate | FN1: (DNR) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | NR: REVAK |
2021-03-17 | Senate | DP: STEVENS, GRAY-JACKSON, HOLLAND |
2021-03-17 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2021-01-22 | Senate | L&C, RES |
2021-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-01-22 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |