AK SB24 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/20/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/20/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the applicability of the Legislative Ethics Act to legislative interns, legislative volunteers, legislative consultants, legislative independent contractors, sole proprietorships, and other legal entities; and excluding contractors and persons who work for contractors from participating in certain benefit plans provided by the state, certain political subdivisions, or certain public organizations based on performing fee-based or contract services.
Title
Retirement Elig; Legislative Ethics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 24(JUD)? (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-16 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate:
2016-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-16 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate:
CSSB 24(JUD) Third Reading - Final Passage(Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/20/16 |
2016-07-11 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/22 CHAPTER 29 SLA 16 |
2016-06-11 | Senate | 3:53 PM 6/8/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-04-17 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2016-04-17 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2016-04-17 | House | VERSION: CSSB 24(JUD) AM H |
2016-04-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2016-04-17 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 N2 E1 A1 |
2016-04-17 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 34 |
2016-04-17 | House | AM NO 1 AS AM ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-17 | House | AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-17 | House | AM NO 1 BEFORE HOUSE |
2016-04-17 | House | RESCIND ACTION (ADP) AM 1 UC |
2016-04-17 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2016-04-17 | House | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING |
2016-04-16 | House | MILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2016-04-16 | House | PASSED Y35 N4 E1 |
2016-04-16 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 24(JUD) AM H |
2016-04-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-16 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2016-04-16 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y34 N4 E1 A1 |
2016-04-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-16 | House | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/16/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | FN2: ZERO(LEG) |
2016-04-12 | House | NR: KELLER, LEDOUX |
2016-04-12 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN, CLAMAN, FOSTER |
2016-04-12 | House | JUD RPT 4DP 2NR |
2016-04-07 | House | FN2: ZERO(LEG) |
2016-04-07 | House | NR: SPOHNHOLZ, STUTES, KELLER, TALERICO, VAZQUEZ |
2016-04-07 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN |
2016-04-07 | House | STA RPT 2DP 5NR |
2016-04-04 | House | STA, JUD |
2016-04-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-04-01 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 24(JUD) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N1 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 24(JUD) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-01 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-01 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-01 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(LEG) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, MICCICHE |
2016-03-02 | Senate | DP: MCGUIRE, COSTELLO, COGHILL |
2016-03-02 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 3DP 2NR NEW TITLE |
2015-04-01 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | NR: STOLTZE, HUGGINS |
2015-04-01 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, MCGUIRE |
2015-04-01 | Senate | STA RPT 2DP 2NR |
2015-01-21 | Senate | STA, JUD |
2015-01-21 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |