AK SB22 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the commencement of actions for felony sex trafficking and felony human trafficking; relating to the crime of sexual assault; relating to the crime of unlawful contact; relating to forfeiture for certain crimes involving prostitution; relating to the time in which to commence certain prosecutions; relating to release in a prosecution for stalking or a crime involving domestic violence or for violation of a condition of release in connection with a crime involving domestic violence; relating to interception of private communications for certain sex trafficking or human trafficking offenses; relating to use of evidence of sexual conduct concerning victims of certain crimes; relating to consideration at sentencing of the effect of a crime on the victim; relating to the time to make an application for credit for time served in a treatment program or while in other custody; relating to suspending imposition of sentence for sex trafficking; relating to consecutive sentences for convictions of certain crimes involving child pornography or indecent materials to minors; relating to the referral of sexual felonies to a three-judge panel; relating to the definition of 'sexual felony' for sentencing and probation for conviction of certain crimes; relating to the definition of 'sex offense' regarding sex offender registration; relating to the definition of 'victim counseling centers' for disclosure of certain communications concerning sexual assault or domestic violence; relating to violent crimes compensation; relating to certain information in retention election of judges concerning sentencing of persons convicted of felonies; relating to the rights of certain victims of sexual assault to obtain legal and equitable remedies for injuries arising from the conduct of a perpetrator; relating to the definition of 'sexual assault' for the purpose of adoption and the termination of parental rights in certain proceedings; relating to remission of sentences for certain sexual felony offenders; relating to forms for sexual assault, stalking, and domestic violence protective orders; relating to the subpoena power of the attorney general in cases involving the use of an Internet service account; relating to reasonable efforts in child-in-need-of-aid cases involving sexual abuse or sex offender registration; relating to mandatory reporting by athletic coaches of child abuse or neglect; making conforming amendments; amending Rules 16, 32.1(b)(1), and 32.2(a), Alaska Rules of Criminal Procedure, and Rules 404(a) and (b), Alaska Rules of Evidence; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Crimes; Victims; Child Abuse And Neglect
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 22(FIN)? Court Rules Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rules Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 22(FIN)? Court Rules Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rules Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/13 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 43 SLA 13 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | 9:46 AM 6/5/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-04-12 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-12 | Senate | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-12 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP |
2013-04-12 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 22(FIN) |
2013-04-12 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2013-04-12 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-12 | House | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-12 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y37 N1 E2 |
2013-04-12 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2013-04-12 | House | PRUITT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2013-04-12 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-12 | House | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-12 | House | PASSED Y36 N1 E2 A1 |
2013-04-12 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 22(FIN) |
2013-04-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-12 | House | FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2013 |
2013-04-11 | House | FN13: ZERO(CRT) |
2013-04-11 | House | FN12: INDETERMINATE(CRT) |
2013-04-11 | House | FN11: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-04-11 | House | FN10: INDETERMINATE(COR) |
2013-04-11 | House | FN9: ZERO(LAW) |
2013-04-11 | House | FN8: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2013-04-11 | House | FN7: ZERO(DHS) |
2013-04-11 | House | FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2013-04-11 | House | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-04-11 | House | AM: KAWASAKI |
2013-04-11 | House | NR: MUNOZ, T.WILSON |
2013-04-11 | House | DP: HOLMES, THOMPSON, EDGMON, GARA, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, STOLTZE |
2013-04-11 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 12 |
2013-04-11 | House | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 7DP 2NR 1AM |
2013-04-02 | House | FIN |
2013-04-02 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-04-01 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 22(FIN) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-01 | Senate | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-01 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2013-04-01 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 22(FIN) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/1 CALENDAR |
2013-03-29 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-03-29 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-03-29 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2013 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | FN12: INDETERMINATE(CRT) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | FN11: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | FN10: INDETERMINATE(COR) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | FN9: ZERO(LAW) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | FN8: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(DHS) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON |
2013-03-28 | Senate | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY |
2013-03-28 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 3DP 2NR NEW TITLE |
2013-03-15 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(DHS) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | FN6: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(LAW) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | FN3: INDETERMINATE(COR) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | FN1: (DPS) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, MCGUIRE, DYSON |
2013-03-15 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 3DP NEW TITLE |
2013-01-18 | Senate | FN6: INDETERMINATE(ADM) CORRECTED |
2013-01-18 | Senate | FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM) CORRECTED |
2013-01-16 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2013-01-16 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(DHS) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | FN6: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(LAW) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | FN3: INDETERMINATE(COR) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | FN1: (DPS) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | JUD, FIN |
2013-01-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Attorney General
Child Abuse
Child Custody
Communications
Corrections
Court Rules
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Domestic Violence
Hearings
Internet
Judges
Military
Minors
Pornography
Privileges & Immunities
School Districts
Schools
Sentencing
Sports
Subpoenas
Victims Rights
Witnesses
Child Abuse
Child Custody
Communications
Corrections
Court Rules
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Domestic Violence
Hearings
Internet
Judges
Military
Minors
Pornography
Privileges & Immunities
School Districts
Schools
Sentencing
Sports
Subpoenas
Victims Rights
Witnesses