AK SB214 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 21 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - MANIFEST ERROR(S) - SEE FULL TEXT ABOVE
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 21 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - MANIFEST ERROR(S) - SEE FULL TEXT ABOVE
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to independent portable electronics adjuster licensing.
Title
Portable Electronics Insurance Adjusters
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) - SEE FULL TEXT ABOVE |
2014-04-22 | Senate | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2014-04-21 | House | VERSION: CSSB 214(L&C) AM |
2014-04-21 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-20 | House | PASSED Y38 A2 |
2014-04-20 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 214(L&C) AM |
2014-04-20 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-20 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-20 | House | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/20/2014 |
2014-04-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-04-17 | House | NR: CHENAULT, HERRON, JOSEPHSON, OLSON |
2014-04-17 | House | DP: REINBOLD |
2014-04-17 | House | L&C RPT 1DP 4NR |
2014-04-15 | House | L&C |
2014-04-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-14 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 214(L&C) AM |
2014-04-14 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2014-04-14 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2014-04-14 | Senate | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-14 | Senate | AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED |
2014-04-14 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-14 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 214(L&C) |
2014-04-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR |
2014-04-12 | Senate | L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | DP: DUNLEAVY, STEDMAN, MICCICHE |
2014-04-09 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 3DP NEW TITLE |
2014-03-21 | Senate | L&C |
2014-03-21 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |