AK SB21 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to occupational licensing of members of the military and their spouses; relating to mobile intensive care paramedics; relating to duties of the State Medical Board and the Department of Health and Social Services; and providing for an effective date.
Title
License Mobile Intensive Care Paramedics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment(s) Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-30 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2021-08-30 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/25 CHAPTER 29 SLA 21 |
2021-08-23 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2021-08-23 | Senate | 4:45 P.M. 8/20/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-28 | House | FN2: (CC:HB69/CED) |
2021-06-28 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 69 |
2021-06-28 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-17 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1 |
2021-05-14 | House | VERSION: HCS SB 21(L&C) AM H |
2021-05-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2021-05-14 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SHAW, JOSEPHSON, TILTON, TARR, VANCE, RAUSCHER, KAUFMAN |
2021-05-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-14 | House | PASSED Y38 E1 A1 |
2021-05-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 21(L&C) AM H |
2021-05-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-14 | House | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-14 | House | MOTION TO DIVIDE AM NO 2 WITHDRAWN |
2021-05-14 | House | AM NO 2 OFFERED |
2021-05-14 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-14 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 6 |
2021-05-14 | House | L&C HCS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2021 |
2021-05-12 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCCARTY |
2021-05-12 | House | FIN REFERRAL REMOVED |
2021-05-10 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C |
2021-05-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2021-05-07 | House | DP: SNYDER, SCHRAGE, NELSON, KAUFMAN, MCCARTY, SPOHNHOLZ, FIELDS |
2021-05-07 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 6 |
2021-05-07 | House | L&C RPT HCS(L&C) NEW TITLE 7DP |
2021-05-06 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): NELSON |
2021-04-16 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): CRONK |
2021-04-16 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2021-04-16 | House | NR: KURKA, ZULKOSKY |
2021-04-16 | House | DP: FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ, MCCARTY, PRAX, SNYDER |
2021-04-16 | House | HSS RPT 5DP 2NR |
2021-03-24 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2021-03-24 | House | HSS, L&C |
2021-03-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-03-22 | Senate | VERSION: SB 21 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-03-22 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): WILSON, GRAY-JACKSON, OLSON, KAWASAKI, STEVENS |
2021-03-22 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 21 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-03-22 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-03-22 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | DP: HOLLAND, STEVENS, GRAY-JACKSON, REVAK |
2021-03-17 | Senate | L&C RPT 4DP |
2021-03-05 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | NR: BEGICH |
2021-03-05 | Senate | DP: WILSON, COSTELLO, HUGHES |
2021-03-05 | Senate | HSS RPT 3DP 1NR |
2021-03-03 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, HUGHES, MICCICHE |
2021-01-22 | Senate | HSS, L&C |
2021-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-01-22 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Health & Social Services
Liability
Licensing
Medical Care
Municipalities
Occupations & Professions
Health & Social Services
Liability
Licensing
Medical Care
Municipalities
Occupations & Professions