AK SB20 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-18 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to teaching certificates for teachers holding out-of-state certificates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Out Of State Teacher Reciprocity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-18SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2022-05-18SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
2022-05-18SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
2022-05-18HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 20(EDC)
2022-05-18HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2022-05-18HouseRESCIND ACTION ON PASSAGE FAILED Y10 N28 A2
2022-05-18HousePASSED Y39 N1
2022-05-18HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 20(EDC)
2022-05-17HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, NELSON
2022-05-17HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR
2022-05-17HouseEDC HCS ADOPTED UC
2022-05-17HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-05-17HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022
2022-05-15HouseFN3: (EED)
2022-05-15HouseAM: THOMPSON
2022-05-15HouseNR: LEBON, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN
2022-05-15HouseDNP: CARPENTER
2022-05-15HouseDP: ORTIZ, WOOL, JOHNSON, MERRICK, FOSTER
2022-05-15HouseFIN RPT HCS(EDC) 5DP 1DNP 3NR 1AM
2022-02-28HouseFN3: (EED)
2022-02-28HouseDP: CRONK, GILLHAM, PRAX, ZULKOSKY, HOPKINS, STORY, DRUMMOND
2022-02-28HouseEDC RPT HCS(EDC) 7DP
2022-02-17HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
2021-05-19HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): STORY
2021-05-04HouseEDC, FIN
2021-05-04HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-05-03SenateVERSION: CSSB 20(FIN)
2021-05-03SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-05-03SenatePASSED Y17 N- E2 A1
2021-05-03SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2021-05-03SenateAM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N11 E2 A1
2021-05-03SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
2021-05-03SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 20(FIN)
2021-04-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/3 CALENDAR
2021-04-30SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2021-04-30SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-04-30SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2021
2021-04-23SenateFN2: (EED)
2021-04-23SenateAM: WIELECHOWSKI
2021-04-23SenateNR: WILSON
2021-04-23SenateDP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, OLSON, VON IMHOF
2021-04-23SenateFIN RPT CS 5DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE
2021-03-19SenateFN1: (EED)
2021-03-19SenateDP: HOLLAND, STEVENS, MICCICHE, BEGICH
2021-03-19SenateEDC RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
2021-01-22SenateEDC, FIN
2021-01-22SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-01-22SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback