AK SB193 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to bonds required for contractors; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contractors: Bonds; Licensing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SB 193? Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-11SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15
2014-07-11SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 70 SLA 14
2014-07-02Senate9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2014-06-02SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S) - SEE FULL TEXT ABOVE
2014-04-20SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2014-04-20SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N1
2014-04-20SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2014-04-19HouseVERSION: HCS SB 193(FIN)
2014-04-19HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2014-04-19HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2014-04-19HousePASSED Y38 A2
2014-04-19HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 193(FIN)
2014-04-19HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-19HouseFIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-19HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-19HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2014
2014-04-19HouseFN6: ZERO(LWF)
2014-04-19HouseFN5: ZERO(CED)
2014-04-19HouseNR: GUTTENBERG, T.WILSON, NEUMAN, STOLTZE
2014-04-19HouseDP: HOLMES, THOMPSON, GARA, EDGMON, MUNOZ, COSTELLO, AUSTERMAN
2014-04-19HouseTECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
2014-04-19HouseFIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 7DP 4NR
2014-04-17HouseFN4: ZERO(LWF)
2014-04-17HouseFN3: ZERO(CED)
2014-04-17HouseDP: CHENAULT, REINBOLD, HERRON, OLSON
2014-04-17HouseL&C RPT 4DP
2014-04-16HouseL&C, FIN
2014-04-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2014-04-15SenateVERSION: SB 193
2014-04-15SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2014-04-15SenatePASSED Y19 N1
2014-04-15SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, DYSON, BISHOP
2014-04-15SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 193
2014-04-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-15SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-15SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2014
2014-04-12SenateFN2: INDETERMINATE(LWF)
2014-04-12SenateFN1: INDETERMINATE(CED)
2014-04-12SenateAM: DUNLEAVY
2014-04-12SenateNR: OLSON
2014-04-12SenateDP: KELLY, MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, HOFFMAN
2014-04-12SenateFIN RPT 5DP 1NR 1AM
2014-04-11SenateFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
2014-04-11SenateFN2: INDETERMINATE(LWF)
2014-04-11SenateFN1: INDETERMINATE(CED)
2014-04-11SenateAM: DUNLEAVY
2014-04-11SenateNR: STEDMAN
2014-04-11SenateDP: MICCICHE
2014-04-11SenateL&C RPT 1DP 1NR 1AM
2014-02-21SenateL&C
2014-02-21SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback