AK SB185 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-08 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 8/31/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-08 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 8/31/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to reemployment of persons who retire under the teachers' retirement system.
Title
Reemployment Of Retired Teachers & Admin
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-08 | Senate | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 8/31/18 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-08-08 | Senate | 3:08 PM 8/8/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-10 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON, ZULKOSKY, DRUMMOND, STUTES |
2018-05-10 | House | VERSION: CSSB 185(EDC) |
2018-05-10 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-10 | House | PASSED Y37 N1 E1 A1 |
2018-05-10 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 185(EDC) |
2018-05-10 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-10 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2018-05-10 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2018-05-10 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING MOTION WITHDRAWN |
2018-05-10 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN |
2018-04-26 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP |
2018-04-17 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, GRENN, WILSON |
2018-04-17 | House | FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2018-04-17 | House | NR: KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG, PRUITT, ORTIZ, TILTON |
2018-04-17 | House | DP: GARA, WILSON, THOMPSON, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-17 | House | FIN RPT 6DP 5NR |
2018-04-15 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSTON |
2018-04-15 | House | FIN |
2018-04-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-14 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 185(EDC) |
2018-04-14 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-04-14 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2018-04-14 | Senate | BEGICH MOTION TO ABSTAIN FROM VOTING |
2018-04-14 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2018-04-14 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N14 A1 |
2018-04-14 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2018-04-14 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 185(EDC) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | HOFFMAN, OLSON, KELLY |
2018-04-13 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): STEVENS, BISHOP, STEDMAN, COSTELLO, VON IMHOF, MEYER |
2018-04-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR |
2018-04-13 | Senate | EDC CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-13 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-13 | Senate | WILSON MOTION TO ABSTAIN FROM VOTING |
2018-04-13 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-04-12 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-04-12 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(EDC) 6DP 1NR |
2018-03-14 | Senate | FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | DP: STEVENS, BEGICH, COGHILL, HUGHES |
2018-03-14 | Senate | EDC RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE |
2018-02-16 | Senate | EDC, FIN |
2018-02-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |