AK SB175 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-19 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-19 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the official state bolt-action rifle.
Title
Official State Bolt-action Rifle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-19 | Senate | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2014-04-18 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2014-04-18 | House | VERSION: CSSB 175(STA) |
2014-04-18 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-18 | House | PASSED Y35 E1 A4 |
2014-04-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 175(STA) |
2014-04-18 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-18 | House | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/18/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLER |
2014-04-08 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-08 | House | DP: GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, HUGHES, LYNN |
2014-04-08 | House | STA RPT 6DP |
2014-03-31 | House | STA |
2014-03-31 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-28 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 175(STA) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, BISHOP, COGHILL, FAIRCLOUGH, GIESSEL |
2014-03-28 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 175(STA) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-28 | Senate | STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-28 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-28 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI |
2014-03-12 | Senate | DP: DYSON, COGHILL, GIESSEL |
2014-03-12 | Senate | STA RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2014-02-14 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, MEYER |
2014-02-14 | Senate | STA |
2014-02-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |