AK SB173 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to a prohibition on the possession, offer, display, marketing, advertising for sale, or sale of illicit synthetic drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Synthetic Drugs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 173(JUD)? (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-17SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14
2014-07-17SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 7/16 CHAPTER 86 SLA 14
2014-07-14Senate11:13 AM 7/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2014-05-27SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S) - SEE FULL TEXT ABOVE
2014-04-19SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
2014-04-19SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2014-04-18HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 173(JUD)
2014-04-18HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2014-04-18HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KITO III, LYNN, STOLTZE, JOSEPHSON, PRUITT
2014-04-18HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40
2014-04-18HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2014-04-18HouseGARA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2014-04-18HousePASSED Y40
2014-04-18HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 173(JUD)
2014-04-18HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-18HouseJUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-18HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-18HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2014
2014-04-16HouseFIN REFERRAL REMOVED
2014-04-16HouseFN6: ZERO(ADM)
2014-04-16HouseFN5: ZERO(ADM)
2014-04-16HouseFN4: ZERO(DHS)
2014-04-16HouseFN1: ZERO(DPS)
2014-04-16HouseNR: LEDOUX
2014-04-16HouseDP: FOSTER, GRUENBERG, LYNN, KELLER
2014-04-16HouseJUD RPT HCS(JUD) 4DP 1NR
2014-03-31HouseJUD, FIN
2014-03-31HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2014-03-28SenateVERSION: CSSB 173(JUD)
2014-03-28SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2014-03-28SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2014-03-28SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 173(JUD)
2014-03-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-03-28SenateJUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-03-28SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-03-28SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2014
2014-03-18SenateFIN REFERRAL REMOVED
2014-03-14SenateFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
2014-03-14SenateFN4: ZERO(DHS)
2014-03-14SenateFN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2014-03-14SenateFN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2014-03-14SenateFN1: ZERO(DPS)
2014-03-14SenateAM: WIELECHOWSKI
2014-03-14SenateNR: OLSON
2014-03-14SenateDP: COGHILL, MCGUIRE, DYSON
2014-03-14SenateJUD RPT CS 3DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE
2014-02-14SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, BISHOP, GARDNER, GIESSEL, ELLIS, MICCICHE, KELLY
2014-02-14SenateJUD
2014-02-14SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback