AK SB165 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-28 - COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-28 - COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the use of credited military service by retired peace officers and firefighters to meet certain requirements for major medical insurance coverage; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Pers Credit For Military Service
Sponsors
Sen. Lesil McGuire [R] | Sen. Peter Micciche [R] | Sen. Frederick Dyson [R] | Sen. Gary Stevens [R] |
Sen. Click Bishop [R] | Sen. Dennis Egan [D] | Sen. Johnny Ellis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS |
2014-02-21 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): EGAN |
2014-02-10 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, DYSON, STEVENS, BISHOP |
2014-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2014-02-07 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2014-02-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=SB165 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0165A.PDF |