AK SB151 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to chemicals that are of high concern for children and to the manufacture and sale of products containing certain flame retardant chemicals; relating to an interstate chemicals clearinghouse; adding an unlawful act to the Alaska Unfair Trade Practices and Consumer Protection Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
High-risk Chemicals For Child Exposure
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Olson [D] | Sen. Johnny Ellis [D] | Sen. William Wielechowski [D] | Sen. Alberta Gardner [D] |
Sen. Hollis French [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD |
2014-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-02-24 | Senate | FN2: (DHS) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | FN1: (DEC) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, MEYER |
2014-02-24 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE |
2014-02-24 | Senate | HSS RPT 1DP 2NR |
2014-02-14 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH |
2014-02-07 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, GARDNER |
2014-02-07 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS |
2014-01-31 | Senate | HSS, JUD |
2014-01-31 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Attorney General
Consumer Affairs
Environmental Concerns
Families
Hazardous Substances
Health & Social Services
Minors
Public Safety
Regulations
Sales
Trade Practices
Consumer Affairs
Environmental Concerns
Families
Hazardous Substances
Health & Social Services
Minors
Public Safety
Regulations
Sales
Trade Practices
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=SB151 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0151A.PDF |