AK SB151 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/19/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/19/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to mitigation at sentencing in a criminal case for a defendant found by the court to have been affected by a fetal alcohol spectrum disorder.
Title
Fetal Alcohol Spec. Disorder As Mitigator
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/19/12 | |
2012-06-21 | LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 6/21 CH 54 SLA 12 | |
2012-05-29 | 1:48 PM 5/29/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-15 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, KERTTULA | |
2012-04-15 | VERSION: CSSB 151(JUD) | |
2012-04-15 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2012-04-15 | PASSED Y39 V1 | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 151(JUD) | |
2012-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | FN5: INDETERMINATE(LAW) | |
2012-04-10 | FN4: ZERO(COR) | |
2012-04-10 | FN3: ZERO(ADM) | |
2012-04-10 | FN2: ZERO(CRT) | |
2012-04-10 | NR: T.WILSON | |
2012-04-10 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2012-04-10 | FIN RPT 7DP 1NR | |
2012-04-09 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI | |
2012-04-09 | FN5: INDETERMINATE(LAW) | |
2012-04-09 | FN4: ZERO(COR) | |
2012-04-09 | FN3: ZERO(ADM) | |
2012-04-09 | FN2: ZERO(CRT) | |
2012-04-09 | DP: LYNN, GRUENBERG, KELLER, PRUITT, THOMPSON | |
2012-04-09 | JUD RPT 5DP | |
2012-04-05 | JUD, FIN | |
2012-04-05 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-04-04 | VERSION: CSSB 151(JUD) | |
2012-04-04 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2012-04-04 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2012-04-04 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 151(JUD) | |
2012-04-04 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-04 | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-04 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-04 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | FN5: INDETERMINATE(LAW) | |
2012-04-04 | FN4: ZERO(COR) | |
2012-04-04 | FN3: ZERO(ADM) | |
2012-04-04 | FN2: ZERO(CRT) | |
2012-04-04 | NR: STEDMAN, OLSON | |
2012-04-04 | DP: HOFFMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, ELLIS | |
2012-04-04 | FIN RPT CS (JUD) 5DP 2NR | |
2012-03-23 | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD | |
2012-03-23 | FN4: ZERO(COR) | |
2012-03-23 | FN3: ZERO(ADM) | |
2012-03-23 | FN2: ZERO(CRT) | |
2012-03-23 | FN1: INDETERMINATE(LAW) | |
2012-03-23 | DP: FRENCH, COGHILL, PASKVAN, WIELECHOWSKI | |
2012-03-23 | JUD RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE | |
2012-03-06 | FN4: ZERO(COR) | |
2012-03-06 | FN3: ZERO(ADM) | |
2012-03-06 | FN2: ZERO(CRT) | |
2012-03-06 | FN1: INDETERMINATE(LAW) | |
2012-03-06 | DP: DAVIS, DYSON, MEYER, EGAN | |
2012-03-06 | HSS RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE | |
2012-01-20 | COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, DYSON, MENARD, PASKVAN, EGAN, DAVIS, ELLIS, MCGUIRE | |
2012-01-17 | HSS, JUD | |
2012-01-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-01-17 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/13/12 |