AK SB148 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/19/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to powers of the Alaska Police Standards Council; and relating to background checks for admission to police training programs and certification as a police officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Background Checks For Police & Training

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/19/18
2018-06-27SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 6/21 CHAPTER 35 SLA 18
2018-06-27SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-06-27Senate12:54 PM 6/13/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-04-14HouseVERSION: SB 148
2018-04-14HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-14HousePASSED Y38 N2
2018-04-14HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 148
2018-04-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-14HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y1 N39
2018-04-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-13HouseHELD TO 4/14 CALENDAR
2018-04-13HouseMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2018-04-13HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2018
2018-03-29HouseFN2: ZERO(DPS)
2018-03-29HouseFN1: ZERO(COR)
2018-03-29HouseNR: EASTMAN, LEDOUX
2018-03-29HouseDP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN
2018-03-29HouseJUD RPT 3DP 2NR
2018-03-15HouseJUD
2018-03-15HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-14SenateVERSION: SB 148
2018-03-14SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-03-14SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2018-03-14SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 148
2018-03-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-03-14SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-14SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/14/2018
2018-03-05SenateFN2: ZERO(DPS)
2018-03-05SenateFN1: ZERO(COR)
2018-03-05SenateNR: WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, KELLY
2018-03-05SenateDP: COGHILL
2018-03-05SenateJUD RPT 1DP 3NR
2018-02-09SenateFN2: ZERO(DPS)
2018-02-09SenateFN1: ZERO(COR)
2018-02-09SenateNR: WILSON, COGHILL
2018-02-09SenateDP: MEYER, GIESSEL, EGAN
2018-02-09SenateSTA RPT 3DP 2NR
2018-01-18SenateGOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
2018-01-18SenateFN2: ZERO(DPS)
2018-01-18SenateFN1: ZERO(COR)
2018-01-18SenateSTA, JUD
2018-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback