AK SB140 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/7/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/7/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act classifying certain substances as schedule IIA controlled substances and providing penalties relating to those substances; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Cathinone Bath Salts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/7/12 | |
2012-06-07 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/6 CHAPTER 57 SLA 12 | |
2012-06-06 | 11:20 AM 6/6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-15 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, MILLETT, PRUITT | |
2012-04-15 | VERSION: CSSB 140(JUD) | |
2012-04-15 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2012-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-15 | PASSED Y39 V1 | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 140(JUD) | |
2012-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-15 | MOVED TO FOLLOW SB 23 | |
2012-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2012 | |
2012-04-12 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): EDGMON | |
2012-04-12 | FN7: ZERO(H.FIN/DPS) | |
2012-04-12 | FN6: ZERO(H.FIN/COR) | |
2012-04-12 | FN5: ZERO(H.FIN/ADM) | |
2012-04-12 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2012-04-12 | AM: FAIRCLOUGH | |
2012-04-12 | DP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, JOULE, EDGMON, DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2012-04-12 | FIN RPT 9DP 1AM | |
2012-03-12 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE | |
2012-03-12 | FIN | |
2012-03-12 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-03-06 | VERSION: CSSB 140(JUD) | |
2012-03-06 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2012-03-06 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-03-06 | PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1 | |
2012-03-06 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 140(JUD) | |
2012-03-06 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-06 | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-06 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-03-06 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | FN4: INDETERMINATE(ADM) | |
2012-02-29 | FN3: INDETERMINATE(COR) | |
2012-02-29 | FN2: INDETERMINATE(DPS) | |
2012-02-29 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2012-02-29 | NR: OLSON | |
2012-02-29 | DP: HOFFMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, ELLIS | |
2012-02-29 | FIN RPT CS (JUD) 5DP 1NR | |
2012-02-13 | FN4: INDETERMINATE(ADM) | |
2012-02-13 | FN3: INDETERMINATE(COR) | |
2012-02-13 | FN2: INDETERMINATE(DPS) | |
2012-02-13 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2012-02-13 | NR: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, PASKVAN, MCGUIRE | |
2012-02-13 | DP: FRENCH | |
2012-02-13 | JUD RPT CS 1DP 4NR NEW TITLE | |
2012-02-03 | COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, WAGONER, HUGGINS | |
2012-01-30 | COSPONSOR(S): EGAN | |
2012-01-17 | JUD, FIN | |
2012-01-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-01-17 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/6/12 |