AK SB134 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to medical assistance reimbursement for the services of licensed professional counselors; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid Coverage Of Lic. Counselors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-21 - House - House: Waive Uniform Rule 23(a) (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-21 - House - House: Waive Uniform Rule 23(a) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-21 - House - House: Waive Uniform Rule 23(a) Separate SB 52 (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-21 - House - House: Waive Uniform Rule 23(a) Separate SB 172 (Y: 15 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2020-03-26HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR
2020-03-26HouseVERSION: SB 134
2020-03-26HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2020-03-26HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-03-26HousePASSED Y29 N5 E4 A2
2020-03-26HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 134
2020-03-25HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/26 CALENDAR
2020-03-25HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-03-25HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2020
2020-03-24HouseFN2: (H.FIN/DHS)
2020-03-24HouseNR: MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, TILTON
2020-03-24HouseDP: WOOL, JOSEPHSON, LEBON, KNOPP, JOHNSTON, FOSTER
2020-03-24HouseFIN RPT 6DP 3NR
2020-03-21HouseFIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 (PSD) Y22 N9 E6 A3
2020-03-21HouseW/ SB 55, SB 155, SB 172
2020-03-21HouseMOTION TO WAIVE FIN PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A)
2020-03-21HouseMOTION TO WAIVE RULE 23 WITHDRAWN
2020-03-21HouseMOTION TO WAIVE FIN PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 (FLD) Y22 N10 E6 A2
2020-03-21HouseMOTION DIVIDE QUESTION W/O SB 52 (PSD) Y17 N15 E6 A2
2020-03-21HouseMOTION DIVIDE QUESTION W/O SB 172 (FLD) Y15 N17 E6 A2
2020-03-21HouseW/ SB 52, SB 55, SB 155, SB 172
2020-03-21HouseMOTION TO WAIVE FIN PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
2020-03-20HouseFIN
2020-03-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2020-03-19SenateVERSION: SB 134
2020-03-19SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2020-03-19SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-03-19SenatePASSED Y16 N- E4
2020-03-19SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 134
2020-03-19SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2020-03-19SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-03-19SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2020
2020-03-18SenateFN1: (DHS)
2020-03-18SenateNR: STEDMAN, OLSON
2020-03-18SenateDP: VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, BISHOP
2020-03-18SenateFIN RPT 5DP 2NR
2020-02-28SenateFN1: (DHS)
2020-02-28SenateNR: SHOWER
2020-02-28SenateDP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, GIESSEL
2020-02-28SenateHSS RPT 4DP 1NR
2020-01-21SenateHSS, FIN
2020-01-21SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2020-01-21SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/10/20

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback